Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Titus, Michael, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Dugaw, Paul Joseph, against 3 Six 0 Motor Sports, Evers, Barbara, Evers, Paul, Thomas, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with James W. Lawler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames W. Lawler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal
Judge: Lawler, James W |
|
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Hearing Stricken In Court Other Reason | |
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Show Cause
Judge: Yeager, Joely |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Yeager, Joely |
|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Show Cause
Judge: Yeager, Joely |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause
Judge: Lawler, James W |
|
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion for Order to Show Cause | |
December 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.