Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Empire Lumber Co., filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Tiller, Laurel Lee, against Davis, Ben R., Rayan Mechanical, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with James W. Lawler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames W. Lawler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2019 |
CategoryFju Foreign Judgment |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Lawler, James W |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Proceeding
Judge: Lawler, James W |
|
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Return on Service | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Regarding Supplemental Proceedings
Judge: Mitchell, Tracy L |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Application to Extend Judgment |
|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Judgment
Judge: Lawler, James W |
|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Application Extend Judgment |
|
July 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Copy Asotin Judgment Summary |
|
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Foreign Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.