Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Matthew Cheung, against Molina, Jose, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Richard L. Brosey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard L. Brosey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 26, 2015 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedOctober 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant and Order to Pay Judge: Brosey, Richard L |
|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ of Garnishment For Coninuing Lien on Earnings |
|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Application | |
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 2nd |
|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion For Judgment and Order to Pay |
|
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application for writ |
|
January 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.