Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Capital One, N.A., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Rahlfs, Roger Edward, against Mills, Bradford, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Richard L. Brosey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard L. Brosey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 26, 2015 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Application For Writ of Garnishment |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Application FOR WRIT |
|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Brosey, Richard L |
|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order amend Pltf name |
|
July 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion to amend Plaintiff's Name |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.