Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Dynamic Collectors Inc, Northwest Surety Llc, Short, Bernard L Unknow Heirs & Devisees, State Of Washington, Strong, Martha J, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 07, 2015 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal
Judge: O'Rourke, Joely |
|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
October 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal D. Brandt |
|
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal B. Brandt |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Return of Service not Found | |
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
June 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.