Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bank Of New York Mellen Trust Co, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Crawford, Scott D, against State Of Wa, Nakano, David S, Ruckman, Michele D, Nelsen, Marvin G, Nelsen, William W. Heirs Devisee, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2015 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal
Judge: Brosey, Richard L |
|
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Diligence 11: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENCE; |
|
May 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Diligence 10: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENCE; |
|
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Diligence 9: AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENCE; |
|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Return of Service 8: RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
April 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Return of Service 7: RETURN OF SERVICE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.