Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lyons, Sarah Lynn filed a(n) Criminal Related (Civil) - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with James W. Lawler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames W. Lawler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2015 |
CategoryRfr Restoration Of Firearm Rights |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeCriminal Related (Civil) |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Restoring Firearms Rights
Judge: Lawler, James W |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Court Hearing Minutes
Judge: Lawler, James W |
|
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Lawler, James W |
|
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
January 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
Petition for Restoration of Right to Posses a Firearm **AMENDED** |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motions PT TO RESTORE FIREARM RIGHTS |
|
February 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Return of Service 3: RETURN OF SERVICE; |
|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 2: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET; 02-27-2015M; PT TO RESTORE FIREARM RIGHTS; |
|
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.