Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Colvin, Joanna M, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carr, Harold D., against Johnston, Christina, represented by Wood, Lesli, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with James W. Lawler presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames W. Lawler Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2015 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 4 DAY JURY TRIAL |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Lawler, James W |
|
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
January 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement and Auth for Clerk to Strike Trial Date | |
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event | PreTrial Report | |
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference
Judge: Hunt, Nelson E |
|
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment *amended* |
|
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment | |
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Assignment for Trial Setting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.