Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dean, Patricia, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Behe, Jessica, Vandal, Gregor, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Nelson E. Hunt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNelson E. Hunt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2015 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Note - Accounting SERVICE FEES; 126.00; |
|
January 30, 2015 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Writ 11: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT; |
|
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Uncontested Resolution | |
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Writ of Restitution Issued 10: WRIT OF RESTITUTION ISSUED; |
|
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 8: MOTION HEARING; JUDGE NELSON E HUNT; COURT REPORTER RANDI R. HAMILTON; |
|
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order for Writ of Restitution 9: ORDER FOR WRIT OF RESTITUTION; JUDGE NELSON E HUNT; |
|
January 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Motions SHOW CAUSE **CONFIRMED UNZELMAN 1/13**JLR |
|
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Response 7: RESPONSE; |
|
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 6: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 5: DECLARATION OF MAILING *AMENDED*; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.