Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Krainick, Pamela, Krainick, Karl, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Williams, Jane Doe, Williams, Keaziah, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Richard L. Brosey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard L. Brosey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2010 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 38: NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE 09/27-09/29; 09-27-2010; |
|
July 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Lewis County Hearing PRE-TRIAL/1:00/DEPT 2/JDG LAWLER |
|
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED EX PARTE; | |
May 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 39: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; STIPULATED; JUDGE RICHARD L BROSEY; |
|
February 19, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING SECOND DATE; 07-01-2010H; PRE-TRIAL/1:00/DEPT 2/JDG LAWLER; | |
February 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Trial Date 38: NOTICE OF TRIAL DATE 09/27-09/29; 09-27-2010; |
|
January 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Assignments TRIAL SETTING |
|
January 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 37: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET; 01-22-2010A; TRIAL SETTING; |
|
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Note COPY TO SUSIE/MS; |
|
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
Note for Trial and Statement of Arbitrability 36: NT FOR TRIAL & STMNT OF ARBITRABIL; NO DATE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.