Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Eames, John, Eames, David, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Kravis, Marshall M And Spouse, represented by Mitchell, Michael C., in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Nelson E. Hunt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNelson E. Hunt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2009 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Receipts 16: RECEIPT OF FUNDS INTO BLOCKED ACCT; |
|
October 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment 15: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - FULL; |
|
October 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judgment 14: JUDGMENT ON ARB AWARD; JUDGE NELSON E HUNT; |
|
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Award 12: ARBITRATION AWARD; |
|
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing 13: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING; |
|
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Arbitration | |
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF ARBITRABILITY; | |
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 10: STIPULATION TO ARBITRATOR; |
|
February 20, 2009 | Docket Event |
Assignments NOTE FOR ARBITRATION |
|
February 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Note COPIES TO SUSIE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.