Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Brodie Jackson, Nicole, against Gerard, Laurie J, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Nelson E. Hunt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNelson E. Hunt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order 53: AGREED ORDER RE JUDICIAL SUBPOENA; JUDGE NELSON E HUNT; |
|
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED EX PARTE; | |
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 52: DECLARATION - GR 17; |
|
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 50: ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; 02-24-2012; SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; JUDGE NELSON E HUNT; |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 51: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
February 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Hearing Cancelled Plaintiff Prosecution Requested CANCELLED: PLAINTIFF/PROS REQUESTED; 2/24/12 SUTTELL *JRS; |
|
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Regarding Supplemental Proceedings 50: ORDER RE: SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; 02-24-2012; SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEEDINGS; JUDGE NELSON E HUNT; |
|
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED SUPPL PROC; | |
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED EX PARTE; | |
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause 49: MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.