Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank South Dakota Na, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Brodie Jackson, Nicole, against Parker, Susan M, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Nelson E. Hunt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNelson E. Hunt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2008 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Release 26: RELEASE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; WELLS FARGO BANK; |
|
June 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Claim 25: EXEMPTION CLAIM; |
|
June 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 24: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 23: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); |
|
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 22: DECLARATION FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order on Show Cause 21: ORDER ON SHOW CAUSE; RE JUDICIAL SUBPOENA; JUDGE NELSON E HUNT; |
|
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 19: MOTION HEARING; JUDGE NELSON E HUNT; COURT REPORTER KATHY MAHR; |
|
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Memorandum 20: MEMORANDUM OF RECORD &; MISCELLANEOUS DOCUMENTS; |
|
April 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Motions SHOW CAUSE **CONFIRMED SUTTELL 4/23 RA |
|
April 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 18: DECLARATION OF SUSAN M PARKER; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.