Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Reality Homes Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Payne, Gaylen Brooks, against Advanced Mortgage Servicdes Llc, Davis, Timothy & Marital Community, in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts with Nelson E. Hunt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNelson E. Hunt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2006 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice 6: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; JUDGE NELSON E HUNT; |
|
December 27, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
November 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 5: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
October 09, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance 4: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; |
|
October 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 3: AFFIDAVIT/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE; |
|
September 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Summons 1: SUMMONS; |
|
September 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Complaint 2: COMPLAINT; |
|
September 13, 2006 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED; | |
September 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Information Cover Sheet 0: CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.