Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Clyde, Patricia, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Lewis County, WA, . Lewis County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2004 |
CategoryEst Estate |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationLewis County, WA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 02, 2005 | Docket Event |
Receipts 23: RECEIPT(S) OF ATTORNEY; |
|
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Receipts 22: RECEIPT(S) - NANCY MCCUNE; |
|
May 31, 2005 | Docket Event |
Receipts 21: RECEIPT(S) - PATRICIA CLYDE; |
|
May 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Declaration of Completion 20: NOTC FILNG DECLAR CMPLTN OF PROBATE; |
|
May 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Completion 19: DECLARATION OF COMPLETION; |
|
May 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Receipts 18: RECEIPT(S) OF ATTORNEY; |
|
May 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 16: DECLARATION OF PERSONAL REP; |
|
May 20, 2005 | Docket Event |
Inventory and Appraisement 17: INVENTORY & APPRAISEMENT; |
|
May 19, 2005 | Docket Event |
Receipts 15: RECEIPT(S) OF ATTORNEY OF ESTATE; |
|
May 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 14: DECLARATION OF MAILING; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.