Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Foskett, Darach, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Haberthur, Phillip Justin, against Nelson, Amber, North Shore Cafe, Llc, A Washington Limited Liability Company, represented by Bremer Moore, Kristin L, in the jurisdiction of Klickitat County, WA, . Klickitat County, WA Superior Courts with Randall C. Krog presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandall C. Krog Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKlickitat County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel 10:00AM Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit DECLARATION OF DARACH FOSKETT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY |
|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Reply PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY |
|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order **SECOND PROPOSED ORDER** GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit DECLARATION OF CARLIE BACON IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Response DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
June 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.