Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ritzschke, Josh, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Bowers, Gregory C, against Ritzschke Family Llc, Ritzschke, Laci, represented by Myre, Bryan P, in the jurisdiction of Klickitat County, WA, . Klickitat County, WA Superior Courts with Randall C. Krog presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandall C. Krog Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 03, 2020 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKlickitat County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order GRANTING MOTION FOR SANCTIONS Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing for Sanctions Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit in Support of Motion for Sanctions |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Sanctions |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Compel
Judge: Krog, Randall C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.