Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case in the jurisdiction of Klickitat County, WA, . Klickitat County, WA Superior Courts with Randall C. Krog presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRandall C. Krog Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2017 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKlickitat County, WA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Statement ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS |
|
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion PLAINTIFFS ATTORNEYS FEES |
|
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment MONEY AWARD |
|
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit STATEMENT OF COSTS |
|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment
Judge: Krog, Randall C |
|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order GRANTING PLAINTIFF SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice HEARING STRICKEN PER JENNIFER HOOK |
|
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
July 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit OF TIMOTHY D. SMITH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.