Case Last Refreshed: 8 hours ago
Derment, Carla, Derment, Shawn, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Levy, Alicia Rae, against Coyote Creek At Nelson Siding Homeowner'S Association, represented by Ufkes, John Henry Frederick, in the jurisdiction of Kittitas County, WA, . Kittitas County, WA Superior Courts Superior with L. Candace Hooper presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeL. Candace Hooper Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 28, 2021 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedApril 19, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationKittitas County, WA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Hooper, Candace |
|
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer Affirmative Defense and Counter or Cross Claim | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Service | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet | |
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.