Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Whisenhunt, Anthony, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case against Huff, Gary, Twin City Foods, represented by Danzberger, Diana Priscilla, in the jurisdiction of Kittitas County, WA, . Kittitas County, WA Superior Courts with L. Candace Hooper presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeL. Candace Hooper Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2021 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKittitas County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Motion Petition to Dismiss Complaint and Summons Judge: Hooper, Candace |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Hooper, Candace |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply ISO MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT AND SUMMONS |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint And Summons |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings Granting Motion to Dismiss |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket To Dismiss |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.