Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hammond, Stacy R., filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case against Ellensburg School District, represented by Mcfarland, Michael Early, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Kittitas County, WA, . Kittitas County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2021 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationKittitas County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Petition for Removal to US District Court | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Statistical Completion | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Motion to Order Compliance |
|
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Recusal of Judge
Judge: Hooper, Candace |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order for Change of Judge
Judge: Sparks, Scott R |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Order the Ellensburg School Dist 401 to Comply with Federal and State Statutes |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration for Change of Judge |
|
December 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Judge: Sparks, Scott R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.