Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bottineau, Donna, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Gilbert, William A, against Hopesource, represented by Morisset, Catharine M, in the jurisdiction of Kittitas County, WA, . Kittitas County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryPin Personal Injury |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKittitas County, WA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice Ex Parte Judge: Hooper, Candace |
|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion and Affidavit Declaration for Ex Parte Order of Dismissal without Prejudice |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Findings Granting Dismissal or For a More Definite Statement |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss or For a More Definite Statement |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket Motion to Dismiss or For a More Definite Statement |
|
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice OF NON-SUIT |
|
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.