Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hammond, Stacy, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case against Jones-Kerchner, Molly, Fyall, Trevor, Read, Sarah, Schantz, Linda, Dalton, Cait, (total of 13) See All represented by Denison, James Timothy, Jr, in the jurisdiction of Kittitas County, WA, . Kittitas County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationKittitas County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Findings | |
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF COUNSEL |
|
April 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR ATTORNEY FEES |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice
Judge: Swan, Jeff |
|
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Continue | |
April 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Swan, Jeff |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket Motion to Dismiss |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.