Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Cheesman, Roy D, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case against City Of Ellensburg, Ellensburg City Attorney, Ellensburg Police Department, Potter, Ryan, represented by Ehlis, Kirk A., in the jurisdiction of Kittitas County, WA, . Kittitas County, WA Superior Courts with Scott R. Sparks presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott R. Sparks Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 09, 2020 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKittitas County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Statistical Completion | |
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing Petition for Removal to US District Court (Federal Court) |
|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice -Defendant and Plaintiff Joint Statement for a Jury Trial Procedures |
|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet | |
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense (No Jury Demand at This Time) |
|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Return of Service | |
November 16, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.