Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hartford Insurance Co Of The Midwest A S O Bob Parman, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Lopez, Stephan Alexander, against Electrolux Home Products, Inc, Electrolux Usa, Inc, Electrolux Home Care Products, Inc, Electrolux, in the jurisdiction of Kittitas County, WA, . Kittitas County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryPrp Property Damages |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKittitas County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated - With Prejudice Judge: Hooper, Candace |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial 1 Day Judge: Hooper, Candace |
|
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Trial Date | |
December 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Assignment for Trial Setting | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Availability for Trial |
|
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Note for Trial and Statement of Arbitrability | |
December 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.