Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cheesman, Roy, filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case against Community Health Of Central Washington, Mcquaid, Millard, Choe, James, represented by Gonzalez, Justo, in the jurisdiction of Kittitas County, WA, . Kittitas County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 10, 2020 |
CategoryPra Public Records Act |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationKittitas County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Recusal of Judge
Judge: Hooper, Candace |
|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Gibson, Blaine G |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice -Denial of Civil Rights |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of False Statement Regarding Institutions |
|
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket Re-note Motion to Dismiss (Scheduled with Visiting Judge) |
|
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Email from Court Administrator to Parties |
|
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Recusal of Judge
Judge: Sparks, Scott R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.