Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hajny, Chelsea, Hajny, Michael, Hajny Trading, Llc., filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case against Mccoy, Aaron, Terril, Lewis & Wilke Insurance, Inc., represented by Berg, James Stephan, in the jurisdiction of Kittitas County, WA, . Kittitas County, WA Superior Courts with Scott R. Sparks presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott R. Sparks Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2020 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKittitas County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice
Judge: Sparks, Scott R |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
September 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Protective Order STIPULATED Judge: Hooper, Candace |
|
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
April 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Answer | |
April 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Summons | |
April 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
April 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Information Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.