Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Kyle, Kamila K, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Digiovanni, Tracy Elizabeth, against Dekalb Street Llc, Mcmurray, John Doe, Mcmurray, Martha, represented by Broughton, William Henry, Johnson, Chalmers Carey, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Sally F. Olsen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSally F. Olsen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2021 |
CategoryQti Quiet Title |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing ORAL RULING / PRESENT ORDERS FOR SIGNATURE Judge: Olsen, Sally F |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing TO OPPOSE WITHDRAWAL AND FOR COURT ACTION Judge: Olsen, Sally F |
|
August 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply -OPPOSITION TO WITHDRAWAL |
|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF CHRIST M. MACMILLAN IN SUPPORT OF DEMCO LAW FIRM, P.S.'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION OPPOSING WITHDRAWAL |
|
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response DEMCO LAW FIRM, P.S.'S; TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION OPPOSING WITHDRAWAL |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration of Mailing | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF KEVIN NAUD IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE |
|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response TO DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO WITHDRAW BY DEMCO LAW FIRM, P.S. AND REQUEST FOR COURT ACTION ABOUT NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.