Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sands, Ciara, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Arcand, Diana, Arcand, Scott Anthony, Bartleson, Aaron, Bartleson, Jane Doe, Kitsap County, (total of 6) See All represented by George, Ione Susan, Johnson, Dan L, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Matthew L. Clucas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew L. Clucas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 07, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal /AGREED MOTION AND ORDER FOR JUDGMENT & SATISFACTION Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Arbitration Award | |
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Association of Counsel | |
July 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Transferring to Mandatory Arbitration | |
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Assignment for Arbitration Setting | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Note for Trial and Statement of Arbitrability 07/01/2022 @ 9:00 SET FOR ARBITRATION |
|
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Void Sub Number Voided | |
June 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
May 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.