Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
The Sage Condominium, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Flanagan, Leonard D., against Bainbridge Community Development, Bainbridge Island Holdings Llc, Doe Contractors 1-20, Ellis, Jean Doe, Ellis, John, (total of 5) See All represented by Estes, Allen W, Iii, Scheer, Mark Preston, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Kevin D. Hull presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin D. Hull Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 21, 2021 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal With Prejudice OF ALL CLAIMS AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS Judge: Hull, Kevin D |
|
May 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Hull, Kevin D |
|
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE |
|
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reconsideration PLAINTIFF'S Judge: Hull, Kevin D |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 HULL - 8 DAYS Judge: Forbes, Jennifer A |
|
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing PLA'S MOTION TO STRIKE DECLARANT'S THIRD PURPORTED OFFER OF JUDGMENT Judge: Hull, Kevin D |
|
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement and Auth for Clerk to Strike Trial Date | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit FOR SERVICE OF SUMMONS BY PUBLICATION |
|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.