Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Allan, Michael, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Morgan, Danica Dawn, against Mcgrew, John Doe, Mcgrew, Karlee, Progressive Direct Inusrance Company, represented by Ayers, Gerrit Jonathan, Wilke, Tiffany Layne, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Tina Robinson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTina Robinson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Robinson, Tina |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated
Judge: Robinson, Tina |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Arbitration Settlement and Removal from Arbitration Calendar | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Transferring to Mandatory Arbitration | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Assignment for Arbitration Setting | |
June 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Note for Trial and Statement of Arbitrability | |
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.