Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Neider Miller, Charlene R, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Armstrong, Ashley Hope, against Effort Enterprises Of Tacoma, John And Jane Doe 1-10, Sims, Charles D, Sims, Jane Doe, represented by Hesselgesser, Ryan J, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Matthew L. Clucas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew L. Clucas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 11, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated
Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Arbitration | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Arbitration Award | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Transferring to Mandatory Arbitration | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Assignment for Arbitration Setting | |
December 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Note for Trial and Statement of Arbitrability 12/17/2021 - PLAINTIFF |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.