Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gordon, Beverly, filed a(n) Tto Tort - Other case represented by Bradshaw, Sunshine Morning, against Bms 2 Llc, Sin, Hyon Sik, Sin, Jane Doe, represented by Sorensen, Kasper, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with William C. Houser presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam C. Houser Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 07, 2021 |
CategoryTto Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Houser, William C |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated
Judge: Houser, William C |
|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Return to Active Status | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement and Auth for Clerk to Strike Trial Date | |
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Transferring to Mandatory Arbitration | |
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Assignment for Arbitration Setting | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Note for Trial and Statement of Arbitrability SECOND AMENDED/ 2/4/22 BEVERLY GORDON |
|
January 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Note for Trial and Statement of Arbitrability AMENDED. *ERROR DATE* TUESDAY 01/25/2022 |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Note for Trial and Statement of Arbitrability 10/22/2021 CALENDAR DATE LISTED ON FORM; MATTER NOT SET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.