Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Williams, Jeremy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rivera, Celia Marie, against Greenberg, David, Greenberg, Harriet, Greenberg, John Doe, Kitsap Mental Health Services, Kitsap Transit, (total of 5) See All represented by Novasky, Robert William, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 HULL - 5 DAYS |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference NOT KDH |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated WITH PREJUDICE OF ALL CLAMS AND ALL PARTIES Judge: Hull, Kevin D |
|
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer and Affirmative Defense TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Summons AND PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint FOR DAMAGES - FIRST |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order
Judge: Robinson, Tina |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.