Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Allen, Penny, filed a(n) General Adminstrative - Administrative case represented by Power, Nicholas, against The City Of Port Orchard, represented by Myers, Jeffrey Scott, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Jeffrey P. Bassett presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey P. Bassett Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2019 |
CategoryPra Public Records Act |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Adminstrative |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Closed by Court Order After a Hearing | |
August 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DEFENDANT'S CROSS MOTION FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW ON THE MERITS Judge: Bassett, Jeffrey P |
|
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion TO SUPPLEMENT RECORD AND DECLARATION IN SUPPORT THEREOF |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing COURT TAKES MATTER UNDER ADVISEMENT Judge: Bassett, Jeffrey P |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment
Judge: Bassett, Jeffrey P |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Reply PLAINTIFF'S - MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Continuance ADMINISTRATIVE 08/14/2020 1:30 PM JPB SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF JEFFREY S MYERS |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF CYNDI M CIRCELLI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.