Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Bowers, George W, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Harris, Leyna, against All Other Occupants, Davis, Gloria, Farnham, Richard, Maxwell, Savannah, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Jennifer A. Forbes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJennifer A. Forbes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 26, 2017 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
September 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Sheriffs Return on Writ 22: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT OF REST; |
|
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ of Restitution Issued 21: WRIT OF RESTITUTION ISSUED; |
|
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT 17-9-01578-1; JUDGE JENNIFER A. FORBES, DEPT 7; | |
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law 20: FINDINGS OF FACT&CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; |
|
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 19: MOTION HEARING; JUDGE JEFFREY P BASSETT, DEPT 5; WRIT AND JUDEMENT GRANTED; COURT REPORTER JAMI HETZEL; |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 17: SUPPLEMENTAL DEC OF GEORGE BOWERS; |
|
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Mailing 18: AFF OF MAILING SUP DECLARATION; |
|
July 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing 15: MOTION HEARING; JUDGE JEFFREY P BASSETT, DEPT 5; SENT TO SCHEDULER FOR HEARING; COURT REPORTER CARISA GROSSMAN; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.