Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Vreedenburgh, Kathryn, filed a(n) Lca Lower Court Appeal - Civil case against Ross, Kathy, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2019 |
CategoryLca Lower Court Appeal - Civil |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter FROM CLERK TO PLAINTIFF |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Notification of Superior Court Decision on RALJ Appeal | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Closure by Clerk | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Clerks Order of Dismissal ; DECLARATION OF MAILING Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution ; DECLARATION OF MAILING |
|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Withdrawing Case From Mandatory Arbitration | |
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Arbitration Award | |
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Arbitration | |
October 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 5: NOTICE OF HEARING; 10-19-2017; |
|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 5: NOTICE OF HEARING; 10-19-2017; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.