Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Rahlfs, Roger Edward, against Mastin, Jane Doe, Mastin, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Leila Mills presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLeila Mills Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Answer of Garnishee Defendant 22: JDGMT ON ANSWER OF GARN DEF; 15-9-02164-5; JUDGE LEILA MILLS, DEPT 2; |
|
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 20: AFF OF SERVICE WRIT OF GARN; |
|
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of NonMilitary Service 21: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE; |
|
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Application 19: APPLICATION FOR JD & ORDER TO PAY; |
|
April 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 18: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT-2ND; |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 17: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.