Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hurde, Marissa, Olson, Casey, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Johnson, Chalmers Carey, against Gustavson, Michael, Gustavson, Marianne, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2019 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Dismissal | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Unclaimed NO MAIL RECEPTACLE; UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Return of Service 4: RETURN OF SERVICE -SUMMONS ETC TO; |
|
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Return of Service 3: RETURN OF SERVICE -SUMMONS ETC TO; |
|
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint 2: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; |
|
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event | FILING FEE RECEIVED; ATTY FOR PLA. / PETITIONER: JOHNSON, CHALMERS CAREY; | |
December 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Case Information Cover Sheet 1: CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.