Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mclellan, Aaron, against Vacha, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with William C. Houser presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam C. Houser Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2015 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice 17: ORDER OF DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE; JUDGE WILLIAM C. HOUSER, DEPT 4; |
|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss 16: MOTION TO DISMISS; |
|
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing Stricken Not Confirmed and Not Heard HRG STRICKN: NOT CONFIRMD & NOT HRD; |
|
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
M Motion Docket MOTION FOR JD ON ARBITRATORS AWARD |
|
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Mailing 15: DECLARATION OF MAILING MOTION,NOTE; |
|
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket 14: NOTE FOR MOTION DOCKET; 05-26-2017M; MOTION FOR JD ON ARBITRATORS AWARD; |
|
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion 13: MOTION FOR JD ON ARBITRATORS AWARD; |
|
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Withdrawing Case From Mandatory Arbitration 12: ORD WITHDRW CASE FROM MAND ARBITRA; |
|
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Arbitration Award 11: ARBITRATION AWARD; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.