Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Psc Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Payne, Gaylen Brooks, against Rannells, Gina M, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Matthew L. Clucas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew L. Clucas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2015 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedOctober 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
April 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order AND SUBPOENA PER RCW 50.13.070 Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR SUBPOENA PURSUANT TO RCW 50.13.070 |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order AND SUBPOENA PER RCW 50.13.070 Judge: Houser, William C |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR ORDER AND SUBPOEN TO ESD |
|
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 53: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); 15-9-02113-1; GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: KINGSTON LUMBER SUPPLY COMPANY , NFN; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.