Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Williams, Amanda Marie, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Douchee, Jessica Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Matthew L. Clucas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew L. Clucas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2015 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter FROM TRANSUNION |
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION Judge: Clucas, Matthew L |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerk's Dismissal | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Unclaimed NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED; UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Unclaimed NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED; UNABLE TO FORWARD |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Clerks Notice for Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
December 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 8: AFF OF SERVICE SUMMONS-JESSICA D; |
|
December 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Answer 7: ANSWER -JESSICA DOUCHEE; |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event | CD RECORD OF PROCEEDINGS ROOM 270; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.