Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Stock, Dorothy, Stock, William, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case against Bell, Jane Doe, Bell, Steven A Md, Does 1-10, Downey, Jane Doe, Downy, Ryan, (total of 8) See All represented by Vanderhoef, Philip John, Wojcik, Matthew R, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Kevin D. Hull presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin D. Hull Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 04, 2015 |
CategoryMed Medical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & AGREEMENT ON DEFENDANTS' COST BILL |
|
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Presentation of Final Order
Judge: Hull, Kevin D |
|
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum RECOVERY OF DEPOSITION COSTS |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Note for Motion Docket | |
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Presentation OF FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
June 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Deposition of CLIFFORD MAH, DPM (ORIGINAL) |
|
June 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Presentation of Final Order
Judge: Hull, Kevin D |
|
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Note for Motion Docket FOR PRESENTATION OF FINAL JUDGMENT |
|
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Jury Verdict After Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.