Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Credit One, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Matthew Cheung, against Brown, Jolie, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2015 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit for Garnishment | |
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 20: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); 15-9-02159-9; GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: HEARTLAND MOTOR COMPANY , NFN; |
|
September 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 19: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 18: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 16: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 17: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: BANK OF AMERICA , NFN; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.