Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Columbia Debt Recovery Llc, Columbia Recovery Group Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by White, Krista L, against Hoover, Miles, Hoover, Monica, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Jennifer A. Forbes presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJennifer A. Forbes Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2011 |
CategoryCol Collection |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment /2ND |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer to Writ of Garnishment | |
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Writ of Garnishment | |
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Application FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of NonMilitary Service | |
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Assignment of Judgment AND/OR CLAIM COVERSHEET |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit OF LICENSE & BOND |
|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 68: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 67: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.