Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Turner, Karly R As Parent And Natural, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Uptegraft, Darrell D., Jr, against Does 1-10, Jane, Does 1-10, John, Darst, John Doe, Darst, Diane, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Sally F. Olsen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSally F. Olsen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2012 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Cancelled/Rescheduled Hearing/Trial/Motion (conversion) 11: ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE; 07-15-2013; 9:00 AM 5 DAYS JUDGE OLSEN; SETT CONF 9:00 AM 30 MINS; JUDGE SALLY F. OLSEN, DEPT 8; |
|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
|
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial | |
May 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated 15: ORDER OF DISMISSAL - STIPULATED; JUDGE SALLY F. OLSEN, DEPT 8; |
|
February 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Witness List 14: WITNESS LIST -DEF DARSTS REBUTTAL; |
|
February 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Witness List 13: WITNESS LIST - DEFENDANTS; |
|
October 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address 12: NOTICE OF ATTY CHANGE OF ADDRESS; ATTY FOR DEFENDANT: Alpaugh, Vivienne Allen; |
|
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Trial Date 11: ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE; 07-15-2013; 9:00 AM 5 DAYS JUDGE OLSEN; SETT CONF 9:00 AM 30 MINS; JUDGE SALLY F. OLSEN, DEPT 8; |
|
March 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Jury Demand Received - 12 Jury JURY DEMAND RECEIVED - TWELVE; ATTY FOR DEFENDANT: Alpaugh, Vivienne Allen; |
|
March 22, 2012 | Docket Event |
Demand for Jury 12 Person 10: DEMAND FOR JURY-12 PERSON; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.