Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jprd Investments Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Williams, Brad Lyle, against Smelt, Robert J, Smelt, Wilhelmina J, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 24, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment | |
November 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Release 19: RELEASE OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
November 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Exemption Claim 18: EXEMPTION CLAIM; |
|
November 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 17: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
October 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 16: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: BANK OF AMERICA , NFN; |
|
October 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 15: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; COMMISSIONER THURMAN LOWANS; |
|
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT; | |
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Stipulation 14: STIPULATION; |
|
July 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Settled by Parties Agreed Judgment No Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.