Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank Usa, Na, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Suttell & Hammer, P.S., against Knuth, John E, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Anna M. Laurie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnna M. Laurie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Mail Returned Unclaimed 23: MAIL RETURN - UNCLAIMED; |
|
August 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Correspondence 22: CORRESPONDENCE FROM FINANCE CLERK; |
|
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Correspondence 21: CORRESPONDENCE FROM CLERK; |
|
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Release 20: RELEASE OF WRIT; |
|
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address 19: NOTICE OF ATTY CHANGE OF ADDRESS; ATTY FOR PLA. / PETITIONER: Suttell, William George; |
|
October 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 18: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 16: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 17: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: US DEPT OF DEFENSE , NFN; |
|
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice 15: NOTICE TO FEDERAL GOV GARNISHEE; |
|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.