Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Capitol One Bank Usa, Na, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Suttell & Hammer P.S., against Mcentyre, Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Russell W. Hartman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRussell W. Hartman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 24, 2009 |
CategoryCom Commercial |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Action With Order | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Judgment
Judge: Houser, William C |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petition FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT |
|
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME |
|
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 17: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: DSHS HQS , NFN; |
|
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 16: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
March 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Answer to Writ of Garnishment 15: ANSWER TO WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; |
|
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Writ Of Garnishment (With Fee) 14: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT (WITH FEE); GARNISHEE DEFENDANT: STAFFORD SUITES , NFN; |
|
February 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Affidavit for Garnishment 13: AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHMENT; |
|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Agreed Order 12: AGREED ORDER RE SUBPOENA; JUDGE RUSSELL W. HARTMAN, DEPT 6; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.