Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Grimes, Ashley Vant, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mcgonagle, William Sargent, against Almazan, John Doe, Almazan, Rose Marie, in the jurisdiction of Kitsap County, WA, . Kitsap County, WA Superior Courts with Sally F. Olsen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSally F. Olsen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2010 |
CategoryTmv Tort - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKitsap County, WA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Action With Order EX-PARTE ACTION WITH ORDER; JUDGE SALLY F. OLSEN, DEPT 8; |
|
October 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
October 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 8: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; |
|
July 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Absence Unavailability 7: NOTICE OF ABSENCE/UNAVAILABILITY; ATTY FOR PLA. / PETITIONER: McGonagle, William Sargent; |
|
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 6: AFF/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE -STATE'S; |
|
March 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Affidavit 4: AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE; |
|
March 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Declaration Affidavit 5: DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE; |
|
March 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service 3: AFF/DCLR/CERT OF SERVICE -STATE'S; |
|
December 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint 2: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; |
|
December 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
Case Information Cover Sheet 1: CASE INFORMATION COVER SHEET; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.